Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-914
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-914
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Richard Ray Roth
Docketed:December 21, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2017-702)
   Decision Date:September 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 20, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Jan 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 20, 2022 to February 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2022. See Rule 30.1.
Feb 22 2022Brief of respondent Richard Ray Roth in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Richard Ray Roth.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 30 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Oklahoma v. Castro-Huerta, 597 U. S. ___ (2022).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Richard Ray Roth

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543