Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-913
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-913
Title:Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe, et al., Petitioners
v.
Lummi Nation, et al.
Docketed:December 21, 2021
Linked with 21A30
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35610)
   Decision Date:June 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2021Application (21A30) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 18, 2021 to December 17, 2021, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Application (21A30) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 17, 2021.
Dec 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 20, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2022Waiver of right of respondent Lower Elwha Klallam Tribe to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 20 2022Waiver of right of respondent Lummi Nation to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
George William Hicks Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

george.hicks@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Deanne Elizabeth Maynard
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2100 L Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20037

dmaynard@mofo.com
202-887-8740
Party name: Lummi Nation
Stephen Hayes Suagee
    Counsel of Record
Office of Tribal Attorney
2851 Lower Elwha Road
Port Angeles, WA 98363

steve.suagee@elwha.org
360-461-2989
Party name: Lower Elwha Klallam Tribe

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543