Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-910
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-910
Title:David Zaitzeff, Petitioner
v.
City of Seattle, Washington
Docketed:December 21, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Washington, Division 1
   Case Numbers:(80436-7-I)
   Decision Date:April 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 22, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 20, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2022Waiver of right of respondent City of Seattle, Washington to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Zaitzeff343 Soquel Ave. #169
Santa Cruz, CA 95062

Party name: David Zaitzeff
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard E. GreeneSeattle City Attorney's Office
701 5th Avenue, Suite 2050
Seattle, WA 98104-7097

richard.greene@seattle.gov
206-684-8538
Party name: City of Seattle, Washington

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543