Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-908
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-908
Title:Kate Marie Bartenwerfer, Petitioner
v.
Kieran Buckley
Docketed:December 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-60021, 20-60023, 20-60024)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 24, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 20, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2021Waiver of right of respondent Kieran Buckley to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Jan 19 2022Response Requested. (Due February 18, 2022)
Jan 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2022 to March 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 21, 2022.
Mar 21 2022Brief of respondent Kieran Buckley in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022Petition GRANTED.
May 17 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Kieran Buckley
Blanket Consent
Jun 01 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Kate Bartenwerfer
Blanket Consent
Jun 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 19, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 22, 2022.
Jul 19 2022Brief of petitioner Kate Bartenwerfer filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 21 2022Brief amici curiae of The Hon. Judith Fitzgerald (Ret.), et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Robert E. Zuckerman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2022Brief of respondent Kieran Buckley filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Kate Bartenwerfer
Iain Angus MacdonaldMacdonald\Fernandez LLP
221 Sansome Street, 3rd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

iMac@macfern.com
(415) 362-0449
Party name: Kate Bartenwerfer
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

zack.tripp@weil.com
202-682-7220
Party name: Kieran Buckley
Janet Marie BrayerLaw Offices of Janet Brayer
P.O. Box 954
Moss Beach, CA 94038

janet@brayer.net
415-286-4400
Party name: Kieran Buckley
Other
Kathryn M. Davis
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Kathryn M. Davis
530 S. Lake Ave.
No. 425
Pasadena, CA 91101

kathryn.davis@kmdavislaw.com
2132200846
Party name: Robert E. Zuckerman
David R. Kuney
    Counsel of Record
David Kuney Law
9200 Cambridge Manor Court
Potomac, MD 20854

davidkuney@dkuney.com
301-299-4336
Party name: The Hon. Judith Fitzgerald (Ret.),, et al.
Peter Vincent Marchetti
    Counsel of Record
Thurgood Marshall School of Law
3100 Cleburne Street
Houston, TX 77004

peter_marchetti@hotmail.com
(617) 270-3143
Party name: Law Professors
Tara Twomey
    Counsel of Record
National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center
1501 The Alameda
Suite 200
San Jose, CA 95126

tara.twomey@comcast.net
831-229-0256
Party name: National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center and Professor Angela K. Littwin

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543