Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-906
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-906
Title:Klickitat County, Washington, et al., Petitioners
v.
Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation
Docketed:December 20, 2021
Linked with 21A138
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35807, 19-35821)
   Decision Date:June 11, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 18, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2021Application (21A138) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 16, 2021 to December 16, 2021, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 08 2021Application (21A138) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 16, 2021.
Dec 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Waiver of right of respondent Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 10 2022Response Requested. (Due February 9, 2022)
Jan 10 2022Supplemental brief of petitioners Klickitat County, Washington, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 9, 2022 to March 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2022.
Feb 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Farm Bureau filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2022Brief of respondent Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Mar 29 2022Reply of petitioners Klickitat County, Washington, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Klickitat County, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation
Ethan Andrew JonesYakama Nation Office of Legal Counsel
P.O. Box 151, 401 Fort Road
Toppenish, WA 98948

ethan@yakamanation-olc.org
5098657268
Party name: Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation
Other
Maureen Louise Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Fox Rothschild LLP
1001 Fourth Avenue, Suite 4500
Seattle, WA 98154

mmitchell@foxrothschild.com
2064095092
Party name: Washington Farm Bureau

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543