Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-902
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-902
Title:Dominic Bianchi, et al., Petitioners
v.
Brian Frosh, Attorney General of Maryland, et al.
Docketed:December 20, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1255)
   Decision Date:September 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2022Waiver of right of respondents Brian Frosh, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 14 2022Response Requested. (Due February 14, 2022)
Jan 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2022 to March 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 16, 2022.
Feb 11 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors of Second Amendment Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Law Enforcement Groups and Firearms Rights Groups filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2022Brief amici curiae of San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Madison Society Foundation, Inc. and DC Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2022 to April 15, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2022.
Apr 15 2022Brief of respondents Brian Frosh, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2022Reply of petitioners Dominic Bianchi, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Dominic Bianchi, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Julia Doyle Bernhardt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
200 Saint Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202

jbernhardt@oag.state.md.us
(410) 576-7291
Party name: Brian Frosh, et al.
Other
Michael Shawn Catlett
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85004

michael.catlett@azag.gov
(602)542-5025
Party name: Arizona, West Virginia, et al.
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Madison Society Foundation, Inc. and DC Project
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
3032796536
Party name: Cato Institute, Independence Institute, Professors of Second Amendment Law
George Montgomery Lee
    Counsel of Record
Seiler Epstein LLP
275 Battery Street
Suite 1600
San Francisco, CA 94111

gml@sezalaw.com
(415) 979-0500
Party name: San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, California Gun Rights Found., et al.
Dan Mark Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Dan M. Peterson, PLLC
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

dan@danpetersonlaw.com
7034253741
Party name: Law Enforcement Groups and Firearms Rights Groups

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543