SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-901
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-901
Title:
Casondra Pollreis, on Behalf of Herself and Her Minor Children, W. Y. and S. Y., Petitioner
v.
Lamont Marzolf
Docketed:
December 17, 2021
Linked with 21A59
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(20-1745)
Decision Date:
August 16, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2021
Application (21A59) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 14, 2021 to December 14, 2021, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Oct 06 2021
Application (21A59) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until December 14, 2021.
Dec 14 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2022)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 04 2022
Waiver of right of respondents Lamont Marzolf to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 05 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 11 2022
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by DKT Liberty Project. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 18 2022
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Cato Institute. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2022
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Laurent Sacharoff. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jan 24 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert James McNamara
Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203
rmcnamara@ij.org
703-682-9320
Party name: Casondra Pollreis, on behalf of herself and her minor children, W.Y. and S.Y.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sara Lynn Teague
Counsel of Record
Arkansas Municipal League
P.O. Box 38
North Little Rock, AR 72115
smonaghan@arml.org
5019786122
Party name: Lamont Marzolf
Other
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036
tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8547
Party name: DKT Liberty Project
Sheldon Eisenberg
Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Triggs, LLP
1230 Montana Avenue
Suite 201
Santa Monica, CA 90403
seisenberg@sullivantriggs.com
3104518300
Party name: Laurent Sacharoff
Jay Remington Schweikert
Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001
jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##