Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-900
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-900
Title:City of Cincinnati, Ohio, et al., Petitioners
v.
Lamar Advantage GP Company, LLC, et al.
Docketed:December 17, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(2020-0931)
   Decision Date:September 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 14 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2022Waiver of right of respondent Norton Outdoor Advertising, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 12 2022Waiver of right of respondent Lamar Advantage GP Company, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 19 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Jan 26 2022Response Requested. (Due February 25, 2022)
Feb 25 2022Brief of respondents Lamar Advantage GP Company, LLC and Norton Outdoor Advertising, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 14 2022Reply of petitioners City of Cincinnati, Ohio, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Apr 26 2022Supplemental brief of respondents Lamar Advantage GP Company, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 26 2022Supplemental brief of petitioners City of Cincinnati, Ohio, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 02 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Marion Eugene Haynes III
    Counsel of Record
City of Cincinnati Law Department
801 Plum Street, City Hall, Room 214
Cincinnati, OH 45202

marion.haynes@cincinnati-oh.gov
(513) 352-4894
Party name: City of Cincinnati, Ohio, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Alan Galasso
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Kelly, Patterson & Tucker, LPA
312 Elm Street
Suite 2200
Cinncinati, OH 45202

mgalasso@rkpt.com
5137213330
Party name: Norton Outdoor Advertising, Inc.
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Lamar Advantage GP Company, LLC and Norton Outdoor Advertising, Inc.
Richard Guy TaftStrauss Troy Co LPA
150 East Fourth St
4th floor
Cincinnati, OH 45202

rgtaft@strausstroy.com
513-621-2120
Party name: Lamar Advantage GP Company, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543