Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-890
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-890
Title:Gaspee Project, et al., Petitioners
v.
Diane C. Mederos, et al.
Docketed:December 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1944)
   Decision Date:September 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent Diane C. Mederos, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 05 2022Response Requested. (Due February 4, 2022)
Jan 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 4, 2022 to March 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 7, 2022.
Mar 07 2022Brief of respondents Diane C. Mederos, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 22 2022Reply of petitioners Gaspee Project, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 13 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street #200
Chicago, IL 60654

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Gaspee Project, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael W. Field
    Counsel of Record
Department of Attorney General
150 South Main Street
Providence, RI 02903

mfield@riag.ri.gov
401-274-4400
Party name: Diane C. Mederos, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543