Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-887
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-887
Title:Miguel Luna Perez, Petitioner
v.
Sturgis Public Schools, et al.
Docketed:December 15, 2021
Linked with 21A74
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1076)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 29, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 08 2021Application (21A74) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 27, 2021 to December 13, 2021, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 14 2021Application (21A74) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until December 13, 2021.
Dec 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors Mark C. Weber and Bernard P. Perlmutter filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2022Brief amici curiae of Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc. and National Federation for the Blind filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2022Brief amici curiae of Professor Jon Dubin and Other Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 02 2022Response Requested. (Due March 4, 2022)
Feb 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2022 to April 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 4, 2022.
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 4, 2022 to May 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 4, 2022.
May 04 2022Brief of respondents Sturgis Public Schools, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
May 24 2022Reply of petitioner Miguel Luna Perez filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Miguel Luna Perez
Attorneys for Respondents
Kenneth Bennett Chapie
    Counsel of Record
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.
101 W. Big Beaver, 10th Floor
Troy, MI 48084

kchapie@gmhlaw.com
248-457-7048
Party name: Sturgis Public Schools, et al.
Other
Selene Almazan-Altobelli
    Counsel of Record
Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.
PO Box 6767
Towson, MD 21285

selene@copaa.org
(844) 426-7224
Party name: Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc. and National Federation for the Blind
Leslie Salzman
    Counsel of Record
Cardozo Bet Tzedek legal Serv.
55 Fifth Avenue - 11th Floor
New York, NY 10003

salzman@yu.edu
646-592-6570
Party name: Professor Jon Dubin and Other Law Professors
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW, Suite 312
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
2026616582
Party name: Mark C. Weber; Bernard P. Perlmutter

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543