Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-883
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-883
Title:Glen D. Gore, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:December 15, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2021-244)
   Decision Date:September 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
2050 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

rsimpson@wiley.law
202-719-7314
Party name: Glen D. Gore

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543