Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-868
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-868
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Kevin Tyler Foster
Docketed:December 10, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2020-149)
   Decision Date:July 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Jan 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of Cherokee Nation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2022 to February 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 9, 2022.
Feb 09 2022Brief of respondent Kevin T. Foster in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 09 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Kevin T. Foster.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Mar 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Kevin T. Foster
Other
Chrissi Ross Nimmo
    Counsel of Record
Cherokee Nation
P.O. Box 948
Tahlequah, OK 74465

chrissi-nimmo@cherokee.org
9184586998
Party name: Cherokee Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543