Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-859
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-859
Title:The Montana State Legislature, et al., Petitioners
v.
Beth McLaughlin
Docketed:December 9, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Montana
   Case Numbers:(OP 21-0173)
   Decision Date:July 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 7, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2022 to February 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 9, 2022.
Jan 10 2022Brief amicus curiae of Governor Greg Gianforte filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David Morgan Steven DeWhirst
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Solicitor General
P.O. Box 201401
215 North Sanders
Helena, MT 59620-1401

David.Dewhirst@mt.gov
4064442026
Party name: The Montana State Legislature, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Randy J. Cox
    Counsel of Record
Boone Karlberg P.C.
201 West Main, Suite 300
Missoula, MT 59802

rcox@boonekarlberg.com
406-543-6646
Party name: Beth McLaughlin
Other
Anita Yvonne Milanovich
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Governor
1301 E 6th Ave.
Helena, MT 59601

anita.milanovich@mt.gov
4064445554
Party name: Governor Greg Gianforte

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543