Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-852
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-852
Title:Christopher D. Lischewski, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-10211)
   Decision Date:July 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 29 2021Response Requested. (Due January 28, 2022)
Jan 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 28, 2022 to February 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 28, 2022.
Jan 28 2022Brief amici curiae of Due Process Institute and Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2022 to March 30, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 30, 2022.
Mar 30 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Apr 11 2022Reply of petitioner Christopher Lischewski filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dennis P. Riordan
    Counsel of Record
Riordan & Horgan
1611 Telegraph Avenue
Suite 806
OAKLAND, CA 94612

dennis@riordan-horgan.com
415-431-3475
Party name: Christopher Lischewski
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Sharon E. Frase
    Counsel of Record
Boersch & Illovsky LLP
1611 Telegraph Avenue
Suite 806
Oakland, CA 94612

sharon@boersch-illovsky.com
(415) 500-6640
Party name: Due Process Institute and Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543