SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-850
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-850
Title:
Chelsea C. Eline, et al., Petitioners
v.
Town of Ocean City, Maryland
Docketed:
December 8, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(20-1530)
Decision Date:
August 4, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
September 2, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 01 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 7, 2022)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Other
Jan 03 2022
Waiver of right of respondent Town of Ocean City, Maryland, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 12 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Devon Myles Jacob
Counsel of Record
Jacob Litigation, Inc.
PO. Box 837
Mechanicsburg, PA 17055-0837
djacob@jacoblitigation.com
7177967733
Party name: Chelsea C. Eline, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Bruce F. Bright
Ayres, Jenkins, Gordy & Almand, P.A.
6200 Coastal Hwy., Suite 200
Ocean City, MD 21842
bbright@ajgalaw.com
410-723-1400
Party name: Town of Ocean City, Maryland, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##