Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-847 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-847 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Johnathan Ian Burns, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:December 7, 2021
Lower Ct:Superior Court of Arizona, Maricopa County
   Case Numbers:(CR2007-106833-001 DT)
   Decision Date:April 4, 2019
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 30, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2021Application (21A53) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 28, 2021 to December 13, 2021, submitted to Justice Kagan.
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2021Application (21A53) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 13, 2021.
Oct 14 2021Application (21A103) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 28, 2021 to December 13, 2021, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Oct 22 2021Application (21A103) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 13, 2021.
Nov 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 6, 2022)
Dec 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2022 to February 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 7, 2022.
Feb 04 2022Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 22 2022Reply of petitioners Johnathan Burns, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Johnathan Burns, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey Lee Sparks
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jeffrey.sparks@azag.gov
6025424686
Party name: Arizona

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543