Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-840
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-840
Vide 21-838
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Aaron M. Frey, Attorney General of Maine, et al.
Docketed:December 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1424, 16-1435, 16-1474, 16-1482)
   Decision Date:July 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 6, 2022)
PetitionAppendix
Dec 22 2021Brief amici curiae of National Congress of American Indians and USET Sovereignty Protection Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2022 to March 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 7, 2022, for all respondents.
Jan 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Maine Indian Tribal-State Commission filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Members of the Congressional Native American Caucus filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2022Brief of respondents Aaron M. Frey, Attorney General of Maine, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Mar 24 2022Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Kimberly Leehaug Patwardhan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Maine Attorney General
6 State House Station
Augusta, ME 04333

kimberly.patwardhan@maine.gov
2076268570
Party name: State of Maine, Aaron M. Frey, Judy A. Camuso, Dan Scott
Other
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Members of the Congressional Native American Caucus
Daniel David Lewerenz
    Counsel of Record
Native American Rights Fund
1514 P Street NW, Suite D
Washington, DC 20005

lewerenz@narf.org
2027854166
Party name: National Congress of American Indians and USET Sovereignty Protection Fund
Luke A. Sobota
    Counsel of Record
Three Crowns LLP
3000 K St NW Ste 101
Washington, DC 20007

luke.sobota@threecrownsllp.com
202-540-9477
Party name: The Maine Indian Tribal-State Commission

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543