Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-84
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-84
Title:Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, et al., Petitioners
v.
Victim Rights Law Center, et al.
Docketed:July 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1748)
   Decision Date:February 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 20, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 18 2021Waiver of right of respondent Victim Rights Law Center, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 18 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 01 2021Response Requested. (Due October 1, 2021)
Sep 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2021, for all respondents.
Nov 01 2021Brief of Federal respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 01 2021Brief of respondents Victim Rights Law Center, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2021Reply of petitioners Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 01 2021Rescheduled.
Dec 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
James Reid Sigel
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster, LLP
425 Market St.
San Francisco, CA 94105

JSigel@mofo.com
415-268-6948
Party name: Victim Rights Law Center, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Jane Doe, et al.
Other
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom
David Gilbert Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

dhodges@ij.org
703-682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 West Jackson Boulevard
Suite 1065
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Cristen Alice Wohlgemuth
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

cristen@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543