Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-829
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-829
Title:Timothy Scott Hardin, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 3, 2021
Linked with 21A66
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-4556)
   Decision Date:May 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 07 2021Application (21A66) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 18, 2021 to December 2, 2021, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 12 2021Application (21A66) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 2, 2021.
Dec 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 3, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 03 2022Brief amici curiae of Due Process Institute and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joshua Brown Carpenter
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders of Western North Carolina, Inc.
1 Page Ave., Suite 210
Asheville, NC 28801

joshua_carpenter@fd.org
828-232-9992
Party name: Timothy Hardin
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
James Wesley Crooks
    Counsel of Record
Fairmark Partners, LLP
1499 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Ste.113A
Washington, DC 20005

jamie@fairmarklaw.com
(619) 507-4182
Party name: Due Process Institute and National Association Of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543