Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-802
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-802
Title:Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc., dba D. James Kennedy Ministries, Petitioner
v.
Southern Poverty Law Center
Docketed:November 30, 2021
Linked with 21A94
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-14125)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 14 2021Application (21A94) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 26, 2021 to November 26, 2021, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentMain Document
Oct 22 2021Application (21A94) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 26, 2021.
Nov 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 30, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2021Waiver of right of respondents Amazon.com, Inc. and AmazonSmile Foundation to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent Southern Poverty Law Center to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 28 2021Brief amici curiae of The Family Action Council of Tennessee and Constitutional Government Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Regina Caeli and True Freedom Ministries filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Religious Broadcasters filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 10 2022Response Requested. (Due February 9, 2022)
Feb 09 2022Brief of respondent Southern Poverty Law Center in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 22 2022Reply of petitioner Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc., d.b.a. D. James Kennedy Ministries filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 08 2022Petitioner letter with opinion received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Mar 17 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 23 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Mar 30 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 12 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 20 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Apr 27 2022Rescheduled.
May 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 10 2022Rescheduled.
May 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 17 2022Rescheduled.
May 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 24 2022Rescheduled.
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 01 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 07 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 14 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Charles Gibbs III
    Counsel of Record
The National Center for Life & Liberty, Inc.
2648 FM 407 E
Ste 240
Bartonville, TX 76226

dgibbs@gibbsfirm.com
727-362-3700
Party name: Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc., d.b.a. D. James Kennedy Ministries
Attorneys for Respondent
Chad Russell Bowman
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1909 K Street, NW
Twelfth Floor
Washington, DC 20006-1157

bowmanchad@ballardspahr.com
(202) 508-1120
Party name: Southern Poverty Law Center
Amibika KumarDavis Wright Tremaine LLP
920 Fifth Ave., Ste. 3300
Seattle, WA 98104

ambikakumar@dwt.com
206-757-8030
Party name: Amazon.com, Inc. and AmazonSmile Foundation
Other
Matthew John Conigliaro
    Counsel of Record
Carlton Fields, P.A.
4221 W. Boy Scout Blvd., Suite 1000
Tampa, FL 33607

mconigliaro@carltonfields.com
813-229-4254
Party name: National Religious Broadcasters
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.
Kimberly Yvonne Smith Rivera
    Counsel of Record
Gibbs Law Firm, P.A.
2005 Cypress Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44109

KRivera@gibbsfirm.com
727-362-3700
Party name: Regina Caeli and True Freedom Ministries
J. Thomas Smith
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of J Thomas Smith J.D., Ph.D.
1113 Murfreesboro Road
Suite 106-167
Franklin, TN 37179

jthomsmith@cgdfund.com
202-669-1452
Party name: The Family Action Council of Tennessee and Constitutional Government Defense Fund

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543