Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-800
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-800
Vide 21-974
Title:Tony K. McDonald, et al., Petitioners
v.
Sylvia Borunda Firth, et al.
Docketed:November 30, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-50448)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 30, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2021Waiver of right of respondent Sylvia Borunda Firth, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 20 2021Response Requested. (Due January 19, 2022)
Jan 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2022 to February 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 7, 2022, for all respondents.
Jan 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Freedom Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of America First Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Protect the First Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief of respondents Sylvia Borunda Firth, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Reply of petitioners Tony K. McDonald, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Apr 04 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Tony K. McDonald, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas S. Leatherbury
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2001 Ross Avenue
Suite 3900
Dallas, TX 75201

tleatherbury@velaw.com
2142207792
Party name: Sylvia Borunda Firth, et al. (all respondents)
Other
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Cato Institute, Atlantic Legal Foundation, and Reason Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
P.O. Box 3073
Gainesville, GA 30503

jackparklaw@gmail.com
678-608-1920
Party name: Buckeye Institute
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect the First Foundation
Timothy Ray Snowball
    Counsel of Record
Freedom Foundation
P.O. Box 552
2403 Pacific Ave SE
Olympia, WA 98501

tsnowball@freedomfoundation.com
(360) 956-3482
Party name: Freedom Foundation
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 W. Jackson St.
Suite 1065
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
John Clay Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
S|L Law PLLC
610 Uptown Blvd.
Suite 2000
Cedar Hill, TX 75104

john.sullivan@the-sl-lawfirm.com
4695231351
Party name: America First Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543