Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-7973
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-7973
Title:In Re Roberto Villarreal, Petitioner
Docketed:May 25, 2022
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2022Petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed.
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 01 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022Petition DENIED.
Jun 24 2022Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Jul 28 2022DISTRIBUTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roberto Villarreal#59214-179
P.O. Box 4200
Three Rivers, TX 78071

Party name: Roberto Villarreal

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543