Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-7937
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-7937
Title:Richard Rodrick MacDonald, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 23, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2022-1256)
   Decision Date:February 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 22, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendixPetitionProof of Service
Jun 22 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 30 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Rodrick MacDonald1884213
Clements Unit
9601 Spur 591
Amarillo, TX 79107-9606

Party name: Richard MacDonald
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543