Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-793
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-793
Title:Pennsylvania, Petitioner
v.
William Henry Cosby, Jr.
Docketed:November 30, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(39 MAP 2020)
   Decision Date:June 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 30, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 30, 2021 to January 31, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 31, 2022.
Jan 31 2022Brief of respondent William Henry Cosby, Jr. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2022Reply of petitioner Pennsylvania filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 07 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert M Falin
    Counsel of Record
Montgomery County District Attorney's Office
County Courthouse 4th Floor
P.O. Box 311
Norristown, PA 19403

rfalin@montcopa.org
(610) 278-3102
Party name: Pennsylvania
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Bonjean
    Counsel of Record
Bonjean Law Group
750 Lexington Avenue
9th Floor
New York, NY 10022

jennifer@bonjeanlaw.com
718-875-1850
Party name: William Henry Cosby, Jr.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543