Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-7916
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-7916
Title:James Fetzer, Petitioner
v.
Leonard Pozner
Docketed:May 19, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Wisconsin, District IV
   Case Numbers:(2020AP121, 2020AP1570)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 16, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 21, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
Jun 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of World Peace Through Education Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James H. Fetzer800 Violet Lane
Oregon, WI 53575

608-835-2707
Party name: James Fetzer
Other
William Sumner Scott
    Counsel of Record
511 S. Orange Avenue, #2088
Newark, NJ 07103

04wmscott@comcast.net
(908) 294-5363
Party name: World Peace Through Education Foundation, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543