Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-779
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-779
Title:Mark E. Schell, Petitioner
v.
Richard Darby, Chief Justice, Supreme Court of Oklahoma, et al.
Docketed:November 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-6044)
   Decision Date:August 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2021Waiver of right of respondents The members of the Board of Governors of the Oklahoma Bar Association and John M. Williams, Executive Director of the Oklahoma Bar Association to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 02 2021Waiver of right of respondents Chief Justice and Justices of the Oklahoma Supreme Court to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 07 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, The members of the Board of Governors of the Oklahoma Bar Association and John M. Williams, Executive Director of the Oklahoma Bar Association
Blanket Consent
Dec 07 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Mark E. Schell
Blanket Consent
Dec 08 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Chief Justice and Justices of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Blanket Consent
Dec 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 27 2021Response Requested. (Due January 26, 2022)
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pelican Institute for Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2021Letter from counsel for petitioner dated December 23, 2021 received.
Main Document
Jan 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 26, 2022 to February 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 25, 2022, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anthony John Dick
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

ajdick@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Mark E. Schell
Attorneys for Respondents
Kieran D. Maye Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Maye Law Firm
3501 French Park Drive
Suite A
Edmond, OK 73034

kdmaye@mayelawfirm.com
4059902415
Party name: Chief Justice and Justices of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Daniel Stephen Volchok
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

daniel.volchok@wilmerhale.com
2026636103
Party name: The members of the Board of Governors of the Oklahoma Bar Association and John M. Williams, Executive Director of the Oklahoma Bar Association
Other
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
P. O. Box 3073
Gainesville, GA 30503

jackparklaw@gmail.com
678-608-1920
Party name: Buckeye Institute
Sarah Elizabeth Roy Harbison
    Counsel of Record
Pelican Instititue for Public Policy
400 Poydras St., Suite 900
New Orleans, LA 70130

sarah@pelicaninstitute.org
5049528016
Party name: Pelican Institute for Public Policy
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Cato Institute, Atlantic Legal Foundation, and Reason Foundation
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Lega Defense Foundation, Inc.
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 W. Jackson Blvd.
Suite 1065
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543