Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-7787
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-7787
Title:Faith M. Hibbard, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:May 5, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1720)
   Decision Date:December 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 6, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 19 2022Waiver of right of respondent McDonough, Denis R. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 13 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Faith M. Hibbard1314 Surrey Loop
Foley, AL 36535

904-495-5603
Party name: Faith Hibbard
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: McDonough, Denis R.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543