Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-7769
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-7769
Vide 21-7892
Title:Lonnell Tucker, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 4, 2022
Linked with 21A547
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3042)
   Decision Date:September 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 13, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 23 2022Application (21A547) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 13, 2022 to May 13, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Mar 25 2022Application (21A547) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 13, 2022.
May 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 3, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
May 11 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
May 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 03 2022Brief amici curiae of Criminal Law Scholars and Legal Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 13 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen C. Leckar
    Counsel of Record
Kalbain Hagerty LLP
888-17th Street., NW
Suite 1200
Washington, DC 20006

sleckar@kalbianhagerty.com
202-419-3286
Party name: Lonnell Tucker
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Dawinder Singh Sidhu
    Counsel of Record
Hopwood & Singhal, PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20006

sidhu@hopwoodsinghal.com
202-769-4080
Party name: Criminal Law Scholars and Legal Organizations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543