Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-746
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-746
Title:Apple Inc., Petitioner
v.
Qualcomm Incorporated
Docketed:November 19, 2021
Linked with 21A39
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1561, 2020-1642)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2021Application (21A39) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 18, 2021 to November 17, 2021, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Sep 09 2021Application (21A39) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 17, 2021.
Nov 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 20, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 20, 2021 to January 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 19, 2022.
Dec 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Engine Advocacy, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Senator Patrick Leahy and Congressman Darrell Issa filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Unified Patents, LLC filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Thales filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2022Brief of respondent Qualcomm Incorporated in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2022Reply of petitioner Apple Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 06 2022Supplemental brief of petitioner Apple Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
6175266000
Party name: Apple Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
7132291855
Party name: Qualcomm Incorporated
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Christopher Theodore Bavitz
    Counsel of Record
Cyberlaw Clinic, Harvard Law School
1585 Massachusetts, Ave, Suite WCC 5018
Cambridge, MA 02138

cbavitz@law.harvard.edu
(617) 496-5155
Party name: Engine Advocacy, The Public Interest Patent Law Institute, and ACT | The App Association
William Henry Burgess IV
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20004

wburgess@kirkland.com
202-389-5957
Party name: Senator Patrick Leahy; Congressman Darrell Issa
William G. Jenks
    Counsel of Record
Jenks IP Law
1629 K St NW
Suite 300
washington, DC 20006

wjenks@jenksiplaw.com
2024127964
Party name: Unified Patents, LLC
Michael Lawrence Keeley
    Counsel of Record
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
1901 L Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

mkeeley@axinn.com
2027215414
Party name: Thales

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543