Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-742
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-742
Title:Lyft, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Million Seifu
Docketed:November 18, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B301774)
   Decision Date:June 1, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:August 18, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 20, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 13 2022Response Requested. (Due February 14, 2022)
Feb 14 2022Brief of respondent Million Seifu in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Viking River Cruises, Inc. v. Moriana, 596 U. S. ___ (2022).
Jul 29 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Felix Shafir
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz and Levy LLP
3601 West Olive Avenue
8th Floor
Burbank, CA 91505-4681

fshafir@horvitzlevy.com
8189950800
Party name: Lyft Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Shannon Liss-Riordan
    Counsel of Record
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
729 Boylston Street
Suite 2000
Boston, MA 02116

sliss@llrlaw.com
6179945800
Party name: Million Seifu

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543