Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-7410
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-7410
Title:In Re Eduardo Pineda, Petitioner
Docketed:March 17, 2022
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2022Petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed.
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Mar 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 18 2022Petition DENIED.
Apr 27 2022Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 06 2022Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eduardo Pineda#27156-078
PO Box 26020
Beaumont, TX 26020

Party name: In Re Eduardo Pineda

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543