Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-735
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-735
Title:Jim Olive Photography, dba Photolive, Inc., Petitioner
v.
University of Houston System
Docketed:November 17, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Texas
   Case Numbers:(19-0605)
   Decision Date:June 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 17, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Waiver of right of respondent University of Houston System to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 08 2021Response Requested. (Due January 7, 2022)
Dec 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2022 to February 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 7, 2022.
Feb 07 2022Brief of respondent University of Houston System in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 21 2022Reply of petitioner Jim Olive Photography filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Owen Joseph McGovern
    Counsel of Record
Beck Redden LLP
1221 McKinney St., Suite 4500
Houston, TX 77010

omcgovern@beckredden.com
713.951.6210
Party name: Jim Olive Photography, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: University of Houston System

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543