Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-7257
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-7257
Title:Jimmy Dale Stone, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:March 2, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2021-1226)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 08 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 1, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jimmy Dale Stone#245269
L.C.C. Unit 5-G2-M
P.O. Box 260
Lexington, OK 73051

Party name: Jimmy Dale Stone

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543