Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-721
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-721
Title:Transpacific Steel LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:November 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-2157)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 24, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2021 to January 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 18, 2022, for all respondents.
Dec 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Members of the United States Senate filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Dec 16 2021Brief amici curiae of Oman Fasteners, LLC and Koki Holdings America, Ltd. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2022 to February 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 17, 2022, for all respondents.
Feb 17 2022Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Reply of petitioners Transpacific Steel LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Julie Clark Mendoza
    Counsel of Record
Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP
1401 Eye Street, NW Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

jmendoza@mmmlaw.com
12022164817
Party name: Transpacific Steel LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Other
Michael P. House
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 Thirteenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20005

mhouse@perkinscoie.com
202.654.6200
Party name: Oman Fasteners, LLC and Koki Holdings America, Ltd.
Timothy Lanier Meyer
    Counsel of Record
Vanderbilt University Law School
131 21st Avenue South
Nashville, TN 37203

tim.meyer@vanderbilt.edu
615-936-8394
Party name: Members of the United States Senate

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543