Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-715
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-715
Title:In Re Jody Tremayne Wafer, Petitioner
Docketed:November 15, 2021
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2021Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed.
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021Petition DENIED.
Dec 13 2021Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jody Tremayne Wafer80606-065
P.O. Box 5000
Yazoo City, MS 39194

Party name: Jody Tremayne Wafer

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543