Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-704
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-704
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Samantha Ann Perales
Docketed:November 15, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2018-383)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cherokee Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2021Brief of respondent Samantha A. Perales in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Samantha A. Perales.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 24 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jan 24 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Samantha A. Perales
Other
Chrissi Ross Nimmo
    Counsel of Record
Cherokee Nation
P.O. Box 948
Tahlequah, OK 74465

chrissi-nimmo@cherokee.org
9184586998
Party name: Cherokee Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543