Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-703
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-703
Title:RLR Investments, LLC, Petitioner
v.
City of Pigeon Forge, Tennessee
Docketed:November 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-6375)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 12, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2021Brief of respondent City of Pigeon Forge, Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anthony C. White
    Counsel of Record
Thompson Hine LLP
41 South High Street
Suite 1700
Columbus, OH 43215

tony.white@thompsonhine.com
614-469-3200
Party name: RLR Investments, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Nathan D. Rowell
    Counsel of Record
Ogle, Rowell & Penland, P.C.
100 East Main Street
Suite 400
Sevierville, TN 37862

nrowell@orplawfirm.com
8654532866
Party name: City of Pigeon Forge, Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543