Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-70
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-70
Title:Gary E. Albright, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:July 19, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2078, 2019-2080, 2019-2090, 2019-2316)
   Decision Date:December 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 18, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 18, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James Harold Hulme
    Counsel of Record
Arent Fox LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006-5342

james.hulme@arentfox.com
2028576144
Party name: Gary E. Albright, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Mark Fernlund Hearne II
    Counsel of Record
True North Law, LLC
112 S. Hanley Rd.
Suite 200
St. Louis, MO 63105

thor@truenorthlawgroup.com
(314) 296-4000
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543