Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-696
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-696
Title:Stand Up for California!, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of the Interior, et al.
Docketed:November 10, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5285)
   Decision Date:April 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 11, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2021Waiver of right of respondents Wilton Rancheria, California to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 10 2021Waiver of right of respondent U.S. Department of the Interior, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jennifer A. MacLean
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 13th Street N.W., Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

jmaclean@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1648
Party name: Stand Up for California!, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: Wilton Rancheria, California
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Department of the Interior, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543