Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6952
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6952
Vide 21-994
Title:Sunrise Lee, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 25, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1369, 20-1411)
   Decision Date:August 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:October 18, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 24, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisOtherPetition
Feb 18 2022Motion of United States for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (February 22, 2022 - Letter to be corrected)
Feb 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 24, 2022 to March 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 28, 2022.
Mar 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2022 to April 27, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 27, 2022.
Apr 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 27, 2022 to April 29, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 29, 2022.
Apr 29 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 13 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter Charles Horstmann
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Peter Charles Horstmann
450 Lexington Street
Newton, MA 02466

pete@horstmannlaw.com
6175199011
Party name: Sunrise Lee
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543