Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-686
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-686
Title:Maria Esparraguera, Petitioner
v.
Department of the Army
Docketed:November 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2293)
   Decision Date:December 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2021 to January 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 10, 2022.
Jan 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2022 to February 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 9, 2022.
Feb 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 9, 2022 to February 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 17, 2022.
Feb 17 2022Brief of respondent Department of the Army in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 08 2022Reply of petitioner Maria Esparraguera filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lucas Michael Walker
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
600 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20037

lwalker@mololamken.com
2025562014
Party name: Maria Esparraguera
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of the Army

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543