Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6826
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6826
Title:Todd Stands Alone, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 12, 2022
Linked with 21A140
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2018)
   Decision Date:August 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2021Application (21A140) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 21, 2021 to January 5, 2022, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 09 2021Application (21A140) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until January 3, 2022.
Dec 31 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 11, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Feb 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 11, 2022 to March 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 14, 2022.
Feb 11 2022Brief amici curiae of Professor Stephen Smith, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 14, 2022 to April 13, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 13, 2022.
Apr 13 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Apr 26 2022Reply of petitioner Todd Stands Alone filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 27 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jessica Arden Ettinger
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services of Wisconsin
22 East Mifflin Street
Suite 1000
Madison, WI 53703

jessica_ettinger@fd.org
608-260-9900
Party name: Todd Stands Alone
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Eric Alan Shumsky
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 10019

eshumsky@orrick.com
202-339-8464
Party name: Professor Stephen Smith, Professor Hadar Aviram, Professor John Burkoff and the National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543