Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-667
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-667
Title:Nathan Ernest Hatch, Petitioner
v.
State of Minnesota, City of Minneapolis Metropolitan Airports Commission
Docketed:November 4, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Minnesota
   Case Numbers:(A20-0176)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 6, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2021Notice of Docketing of Nathan Hatch not accepted for filing. (November 29, 2021 -- Document not of type that is to be electronically filed)
Dec 03 2021Brief of respondent State of Minnesota, City of Minneapolis Airport Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lynne Torgerson
    Counsel of Record
222 South Ninth Street
Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

L@Lynnetorgerson.com
(612) 339-5073
Party name: Nathan Hatch
Attorneys for Respondent
Christopher Paul Renz
    Counsel of Record
Chestnut Cambronne, PA
100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 1700
Minneapolis, MN 55401-2138

crenz@chestnutcambronne.com
6123397300
Party name: State of Minnesota, City of Minneapolis Airports Commission

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543