Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6610
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6610
Title:Cody Allen Bruner, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:December 14, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2020-843)
   Decision Date:September 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 13, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Cody Allen Bruner#627810
Davis Correctional Facility
6888 East 13rd Road
Holdenville, OK 74848

Party name: Cody Allen Bruner

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543