Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6549 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6549 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Wade Greely Lay, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:December 7, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(MA-2021-497)
   Decision Date:June 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 6, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Jan 06 2022Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jan 20 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Wade Lay516263
Oklahoma State Penitentiary
P.O. Box 97
McAlester, OK 74502-0097

Party name: Wade Lay
Attorneys for Respondent
Bryan Gregg Cleveland
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General's Office
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

bryan.cleveland@oag.ok.gov
(405) 522-1961
Party name: State of Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543