Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6529
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6529
Title:Brandon Lamont Jenkins, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:December 6, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2021-572)
   Decision Date:October 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 5, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 20 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brandon L. Jenkins379971
216 N. Murray St.
Helena, OK 73741

Party name: Brandon Jenkins

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543