Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6464 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6464 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:John Fitzgerald Hanson, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:December 1, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PCD-2020-611)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 3, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 03 2022Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 20 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Mary Jernigan McGovern
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender for the Westem District of Oklahoma
215 Dean A. McGee, Suite 707
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

sarah_jernigan@fd.org
405-609-5995
Party name: John Hanson
Attorneys for Respondent
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543