Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6448
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6448
Title:Joseph D. Brown, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 30, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-6296)
   Decision Date:August 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 30, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 30, 2021 to January 31, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 31, 2022.
Jan 31 2022Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Apr 04 2022Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Wooden v. United States, 595 U. S. ___ (2022).
May 06 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Bergmann III
    Counsel of Record
Paul Bergmann, III, Attorney at Law
633 Chestnut Street
Suite 1620
Chattanooga, TN 37450

pb3@epbfi.com
423-756-3245
Party name: Joseph Brown
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543