Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6444
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6444
Title:In Re James Joseph Knochel, Petitioner
Docketed:November 29, 2021
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2021Petition for a writ of mandamus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 29, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Jan 26 2022Supplemental brief of petitioner James Knochel filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.
Mar 15 2022Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 18 2022Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Joseph KnochelP.O. Box 3499
Prescott, AZ 86302

(602) 842-2688
Party name: James Knochel

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543