Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6440 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6440 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Jemaine Monteil Cannon, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:November 29, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PCD-2020-620)
   Decision Date:September 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 29, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 06 2021Joint stipulation to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 09 2021Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Emma Victoria Rolls
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
215 Dean A. McGee
Suite 707
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

emma_rolls@fd.org
405-609-5975
Party name: Jemaine Cannon

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543